Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 508 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18311 Week
» 71327 Month
» 190854 Year
» 3217707 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11170 |
04/08/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2567 |
01/11/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11170 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2567 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2567 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|