Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3453 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16859 Week
» 69875 Month
» 189402 Year
» 3216255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11174 |
30/10/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2571 |
01/11/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11174 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (32F) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2571 |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
20/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2571 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|