Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2578 |
|
01/1899 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Dean Goods |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
111 |
Works Number |
1659 |
To Service |
During 01/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/09/1953 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1908 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2578 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1659 |
|
|
07/1908 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (WES) |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
07/09/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2578 |
|
|