Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3535 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13109 Week
» 78063 Month
» 280727 Year
» 3307580 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2586 |
05/11/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2586 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
12/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2586 |
|
|
15/10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|