Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1260 Week
» 13038 Month
» 302430 Year
» 813532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2587 10/11/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 05
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service 10/11/1959
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 8 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
56A Wakefield (New) 10/11/1959
56B Ardsley w/e 11/01/1964
51C West Hartlepool w/e 25/01/1964
64B Haymarket 4w/e 22/04/1967
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 27/05/1967
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 30/12/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1959 To Service To service as D2587
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Wakefield (56A)
   
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2587    
30/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    

prev prev