Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 4054 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22965 Week
» 87919 Month
» 290583 Year
» 3317436 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2590 |
14/12/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2590 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2590 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|