Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4344 Week
» 16122 Month
» 305514 Year
» 816616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2595 30/01/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 05
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service 30/01/1960
Withdrawn 08/06/1968
Time in Service 8 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 30/01/1960
56B Ardsley w/e 18/06/1960
56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 06/11/1965
64B Haymarket 4w/e 22/04/1967
64H Leith Central 4w/e 27/05/1967
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 27/01/1968
   Withdrawn 08/06/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1960 To Service To service as D2595
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
08/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2595    

prev prev