Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 899 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18702 Week
» 71718 Month
» 191245 Year
» 3218098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2596 |
15/02/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2596 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2596 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|