Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 790 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2905 Week
» 25411 Month
» 328601 Year
» 1550166 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2597 28/06/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 05
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3' 9" engines28/06/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service 28/06/1960 to Holbeck (MR) (55A)
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 7 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55A Holbeck (MR) (New) on 28/06/1960
56B Ardsley w/e 09/07/1960
56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 06/11/1965
64B Haymarket 4w/e 22/04/1967
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 27/05/1967
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
64H Leith Central 4w/e 25/11/1967
   Withdrawn on 30/12/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/06/1960 To Service To service as D2597
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)
   
09/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
27/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2597    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev