Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18242 Week
» 71258 Month
» 190785 Year
» 3217638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D260 |
19/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40060 |
02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97405 |
01/05/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 40 | 19/02/1960 | 97/4 | 01/05/1985 |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
19/02/1960 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
09/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
03/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Information |
Life expired/surplus |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
19/02/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/07/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/07/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D260 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40060 |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
25/07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/05/1985 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/05/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97405 |
|
|
09/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97405 |
|
|
03/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|