Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2604 |
30/09/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2604 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
14/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2604 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|