Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2757 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16163 Week
» 69179 Month
» 188706 Year
» 3215559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2612 |
30/01/1961 |
|
Departmental |
88 |
11/02/1961 |
|
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
51A |
|
Darlington (New) |
on |
30/01/1961 |
ED Faverdale |
|
|
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1967 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/01/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2612 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
04/02/1961 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 88 |
|
|
23/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 88 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Argosy Salvage: Shettleston |
|
|