Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14346 Week
» 67362 Month
» 186889 Year
» 3213742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS |
D2615 |
08/03/1961 |
|
Departmental |
89 |
25/01/1964 |
|
Pre TOPS |
D2615 |
11/1967 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2615 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
24/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 89 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2615 |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2615 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|