Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4362 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17768 Week
» 70784 Month
» 190311 Year
» 3217164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D268 |
28/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40068 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
28/03/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
24/07/1983 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Piston through crankcase,scrap tyres |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
28/03/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D268 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40068 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
24/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40068 |
|
|
10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|