Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 280 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2187 Week
» 20969 Month
» 269262 Year
» 1153643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11700 25/07/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2700 22/02/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/1
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/07/1953
Withdrawn 02/11/1963
Time in Service 10 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1964
Cut At Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51C West Hartlepool (New) 25/07/1953
50D Goole w/e 27/08/1960
   Withdrawn 02/11/1963


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D2700    
25/07/1953 To Service To service as 11700
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Allocated to West Hartlepool (51C)
   
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
02/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 11700    
01/11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev