Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11701 19/12/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2701 19/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/1
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/12/1953
Withdrawn 12/03/1967
Time in Service 13 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1967
Cut At Drapers (Hull)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51C West Hartlepool (New) 19/12/1953
50D Goole w/e 27/08/1960
   Withdrawn 12/03/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D2701    
19/12/1953 To Service To service as 11701
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Allocated to West Hartlepool (51C)
   
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
12/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 11701    
01/06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev