Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 4 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2865 Week
» 21647 Month
» 269940 Year
» 1154321 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11703 29/08/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2703 20/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/1
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L44
Works Number 27431
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/08/1955
Withdrawn 03/02/1968 off Grangemouth (65F)
Time in Service 12 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1968
Cut At Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
62B Dundee Tay Bridge (New) 29/08/1955
64E Polmont 4w/e 23/11/1957
65F Grangemouth 5w/e 30/05/1964
   Withdrawn 03/02/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/08/1955 To Service To service as 11703
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27431
Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
   
23/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (64E)    
13/02/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D2703    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
03/02/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2703 from Grangemouth (65F)    
01/05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev