Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11704 19/09/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2704 12/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/1
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L44
Works Number 27432
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/09/1955
Withdrawn 24/06/1967
Time in Service 11 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1967
Cut At Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64A St Margarets (New) 19/09/1955
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 15/02/1958
   Withdrawn 24/06/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1955 To Service To service as 11704
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27432
Allocated to St Margarets (64A)
   
15/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
12/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2704    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2704    
01/10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev