Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 150 Today
» 1336 Yesterday
» 3923 Week
» 3923 Month
» 193058 Year
» 1414623 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11705 29/09/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2705 08/1959  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/1
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L44
Works Number 27433
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/09/1955
Withdrawn 03/08/1967
Time in Service 11 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1967
Cut At Connels (Coatbridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64A St Margarets (New) 29/09/1955
64H Leith Central 4w/e 25/02/1967
   Withdrawn 03/08/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1955 To Service To service as 11705
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27433
Allocated to St Margarets (64A)
   
08/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2705    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
03/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2705    
01/11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Connels: Coatbridge    

prev prev