Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 188 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 188 Week
» 18970 Month
» 267263 Year
» 1151644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11707 02/02/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2707 14/02/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/1
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L44
Works Number 27435
Cost when Built £
To Service 02/02/1956
Withdrawn 04/03/1967
Time in Service 11 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1967
Cut At Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64A St Margarets (New) 02/02/1956
62C Dunfermline Upper w/e 12/05/1956
64E Polmont 8w/e 27/10/1956
62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 23/11/1957
   Withdrawn 04/03/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1956 To Service To service as 11707
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27435
Allocated to St Margarets (64A)
   
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmont (64E)    
23/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
14/02/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2707    
04/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2707    
01/08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev