Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1539 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15582 Week
» 80536 Month
» 283200 Year
» 3310053 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11710 |
27/08/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2710 |
23/12/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
27/08/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11710 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27705 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
23/12/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2710 |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2710 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|