Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1023 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14429 Week
» 67445 Month
» 186972 Year
» 3213825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11711 |
31/08/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2711 |
15/04/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
31/08/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11711 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27706 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2711 |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2711 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|