Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 447 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18250 Week
» 71266 Month
» 190793 Year
» 3217646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11717 |
23/10/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2717 |
10/11/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
23/10/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11717 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27712 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2717 |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
03/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2717 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Argosy Salvage: Shettleston |
|
|