Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17391 Week
» 70407 Month
» 189934 Year
» 3216787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11719 |
11/11/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2719 |
29/04/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
11/11/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/11/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11719 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27714 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2719 |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2719 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|