Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 459 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6213 Week
» 34171 Month
» 68813 Year
» 1290378 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2723 30/06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D2/10
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L93
Works Number 27818
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/06/1958
Withdrawn 03/08/1967
Time in Service 9 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1967
Cut At Connels (Coatbridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
64A St Margarets (New) 30/06/1958
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 6w/e 30/12/1961
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 27/01/1962
64A St Margarets 4w/e 19/01/1963
64H Leith Central 4w/e 25/02/1967
   Withdrawn 03/08/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1958 To Service To service as D2723
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27818
Allocated to St Margarets (64A)
   
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop SLS 7/1962 Link
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
03/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2723    
01/11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Connels: Coatbridge    

prev prev