Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18134 Week
» 71150 Month
» 190677 Year
» 3217530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2733 |
08/10/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
08/10/1958 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2733 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27828 Allocated to Yoker (65G) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2733 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|