Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D275 |
16/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40075 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
16/05/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
13/12/1981 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Information |
Engine damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/05/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D275 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40075 |
|
|
13/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40075 |
|
|
02/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|