Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1146 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18949 Week
» 71965 Month
» 191492 Year
» 3218345 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2752 |
|
06/1899 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
2721 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
115 |
Works Number |
1714 |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/03/1948 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 9 mths , -1 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1899 |
PZ |
|
Penzance |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/03/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PZ |
Penzance |
4w/e |
19/04/1947 |
WDN |
PZ |
Penzance |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1906 |
S2 boiler fitted |
05/1909 |
S4 boiler fitted |
02/1916 |
B4 boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2752 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1714 |
|
|
05/1906 |
Modification |
Modification: S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1909 |
Modification |
Modification: S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Penzance (PZ) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2752 |
|
|