Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2566 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15972 Week
» 68988 Month
» 188515 Year
» 3215368 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2758 |
01/06/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
10/12/1965 |
21/12/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
12 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2758 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28011 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/12/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1965. Dep: 21/12/1965. |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2758 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|