Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1298 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24929 Week
» 89883 Month
» 292547 Year
» 3319400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2769 |
|
09/1900 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
2721 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
122 |
Works Number |
1784 |
To Service |
During 09/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/03/1949 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
TDU |
Tondu |
m/e |
31/03/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1914 |
B4 boiler fitted |
06/1921 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2769 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1784 |
|
|
07/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tondu (TDU) |
|
|
14/03/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2769 |
|
|