Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 795 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14201 Week
» 67217 Month
» 186744 Year
» 3213597 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2774 |
11/10/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
22/07/1961 |
13/07/1962 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
357 days |
|
6,185 |
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
17/12/1963 |
25/01/1964 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
40 days |
|
|
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
11/05/1965 |
11/06/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
32 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2774 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28027 Allocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/07/1961. Dep: 13/07/1962. |
|
|
17/12/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1963. Dep: 25/01/1964. |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/05/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1965. Dep: 11/06/1965. |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2774 |
|
|