Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19139 Week
» 72155 Month
» 191682 Year
» 3218535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D278 |
08/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40078 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
08/06/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
20/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
20/03/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D278 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
20/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40078 |
|
|
23/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40078 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|