Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 895 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6500 Week
» 18047 Month
» 417729 Year
» 494316 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2807   10/1905

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1905
Withdrawal During 03/1963
Service Life 57 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HFD Hereford 4w/e 07/09/1946
85A Worcester m/e 31/07/1951
84K Chester West 4w/e 05/10/1957
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 12/06/1958
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1958
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 27/12/1958
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/05/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WOS Worcester m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC HFD Hereford 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/05/1960
WDN   4w/e 06/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1905 To Service To service as GWR Number 2807
Built at Swindon Works
   
07/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (HFD)    
31/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 2807    

prev prev