Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 597 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 17749 Month
» 417431 Year
» 494018 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2818   12/1905

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1905
Withdrawal During 10/1963
Service Life 57 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82C Swindon 7w/e 31/08/1952
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/09/1959
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/10/1959
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 15/12/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 04/05/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 04/05/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1905 To Service To service as GWR Number 2818
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 2818    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Dump RO 1/1965 Link

prev prev