Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 415 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 415 Week
» 22921 Month
» 326111 Year
» 1547676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2821 m/e 01/1907

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 160
Works Number 2158
To Service During 01/1907
Withdrawal Wed 21/09/1960
Scrapping During 04/1961
Service Life 53 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1907
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 30/09/1951
81C Southall 4w/e 04/10/1952
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 21/03/1953
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1956
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 27/12/1958
87E Landore 4w/e 24/01/1959
81E Didcot 4w/e 16/05/1959
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 21/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 87E Landore m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   m/e 30/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1907 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2821
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2158
   
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
21/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 2821    

prev prev