Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 422 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 422 Week
» 22928 Month
» 326118 Year
» 1547683 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2845 m/e 11/1912
Great Western Railway (Oil) 4809 on 11/08/1947
Great Western Railway (Coal) 2845 on 15/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 186
Works Number 2445
To Service During 11/1912
Withdrawal Fri 24/05/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1912
PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 31/12/1949
81F Oxford 4w/e 31/08/1950
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 30/11/1950
81C Southall 2w/e 12/07/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/02/1953
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 13/08/1955
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 11/07/1959
84C Banbury 4w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn on 24/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LYD Lydney 4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 14/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). SLS/194710
21/10/1948 Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1912 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2845
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2445
   
11/08/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 4809    
15/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 2845    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
24/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 2845    

prev prev