Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 225 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7685 Week
» 5198 Month
» 233082 Year
» 1454647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D285 18/07/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 40085 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Stone OK4625
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 18/07/1960
Withdrawn 30/03/1984
Time in Service 23 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1985
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 18/07/1960
52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/03/1967
50A York (North) 4w/e 07/10/1967
52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/05/1968
55B York (North) w/e 06/05/1972
GD Gateshead w/e 29/02/1976
   Withdrawn 30/03/1984

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/03/1967
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 07/10/1967
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/05/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
06/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1960 To Service To service as D285
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
06/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40085    
29/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
30/03/1984 Withdrawn Condemned as 40085    
01/01/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev