Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1646 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25277 Week
» 90231 Month
» 292895 Year
» 3319748 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2851 |
03/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
02001 |
12/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2851 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company Allocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 02001 |
|
|
01/06/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 02001 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dudley Hill |
|
|