Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 202 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1947 Week
» 10689 Month
» 354868 Year
» 865970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2853 25/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 02003 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Works Number 2812
To Service 25/10/1960
Withdrawn 01/06/1975 off Allerton (AN)
Time in Service 14 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
27A Bank Hall (New) 25/10/1960
8C Speke Junction w/e 22/10/1966
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 01/06/1975

Preservation
Preservation Date 1997
Current Status Operational
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=02003


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/10/1960 To Service To service as D2853
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2812
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 02003    
01/06/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 02003 from Allerton (AN)    

prev prev