Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 141 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6118 Week
» 22316 Month
» 187216 Year
» 698318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2854 04/11/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 04/11/1960
Withdrawn 28/02/1970
Time in Service 9 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
27A Bank Hall (New) 04/11/1960
8C Speke Junction w/e 22/10/1966
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
   Stored w/e 21/02/1970
   Withdrawn 28/02/1970

Preservation
Preservation Date 05/1988
Current Status Operational
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2854


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/11/1960 To Service To service as D2854
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
21/02/1970 To Store To Store    
28/02/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2854    

prev prev