Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 328 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1194 Week
» 25856 Month
» 284715 Year
» 795817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2855 21/11/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 21/11/1960
Withdrawn 04/10/1970
Time in Service 9 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1971
Cut At Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
27A Bank Hall (New) 21/11/1960
8C Speke Junction w/e 22/10/1966
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
   Stored w/e 09/05/1970
8J Allerton (Reinstated) w/e 06/06/1970
   Withdrawn 04/10/1970


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/11/1960 To Service To service as D2855
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
09/05/1970 Allocation      
09/05/1970 To Store To Store    
06/06/1970 Reinstated Reinstated to Allerton (8J)    
04/10/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2855    
01/06/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Hesslewoods: Attercliffe    

prev prev