Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 202 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1947 Week
» 10689 Month
» 354868 Year
» 865970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2858 21/12/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 21/12/1960
Withdrawn 28/02/1970
Time in Service 9 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
26A Newton Heath (New) 21/12/1960
27A Bank Hall w/e 20/07/1963
8C Speke Junction w/e 22/10/1966
9D Newton Heath w/e 06/01/1968
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn 28/02/1970

Preservation
Preservation Date 06/2002
Current Status Unserviceable
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2858


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1960 To Service To service as D2858
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
28/02/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2858    

prev prev