Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 656 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2771 Week
» 25277 Month
» 328467 Year
» 1550032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2858 m/e 05/1918

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 210
Works Number 2764
To Service During 05/1918
Withdrawal Wed 09/01/1963
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
81F Oxford 4w/e 31/12/1950
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/04/1951
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 17/05/1952
84B Oxley 2w/e 12/07/1952
81C Southall 4w/e 29/11/1952
84C Banbury 4w/e 24/04/1954
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/12/1954
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/05/1960
   Withdrawn on 09/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/05/1960
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
24/03/1946 Stock Returns No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
15/02/1960 Banbury MPD In mid-February, one 'Castle' only was in service (4078) as 5057 was at Swindon and 7011 at Stafford Road Works; 'Halls' were deputising. In store are 2248(85B), 2858(86A) and 5375(84C)-wdn. 10/59. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2858
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2764
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
09/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 2858    

prev prev