Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2455 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15861 Week
» 68877 Month
» 188404 Year
» 3215257 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2859 |
30/12/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2859 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company Allocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
15/03/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2859 |
|
|
04/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|