Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2860 13/09/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 13/09/1961
Withdrawn 13/12/1970
Time in Service 9 yrs , 3 mths
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
24F Fleetwood (New) 13/09/1961
10D Lostock Hall w/e 19/02/1966
8K Bank Hall w/e 18/06/1966
8C Speke Junction w/e 22/10/1966
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
   Stored w/e 25/04/1970
8J Allerton (Reinstated) w/e 06/06/1970
   Withdrawn 13/12/1970

Preservation
Preservation Date 1973
Current Status Operational
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2860


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/09/1961 To Service To service as D2860
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Fleetwood (24F)
   
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
25/04/1970 To Store To Store    
06/06/1970 Reinstated Reinstated to Allerton (8J)    
13/12/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2860    

prev prev