Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 327 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1193 Week
» 25855 Month
» 284714 Year
» 795816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2863 18/10/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 18/10/1961
Withdrawn 31/12/1969
Time in Service 8 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1971
Cut At T W Ward (Beighton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
24F Fleetwood (New) 18/10/1961
10D Lostock Hall w/e 19/02/1966
   Stored (at 10D) w/e 10/05/1969
   Withdrawn 31/12/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/10/1961 To Service To service as D2863
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Fleetwood (24F)
   
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
10/05/1969 To Store To Store (at 10D)    
31/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2863    
01/08/1971 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    
01/08/1971 Sightings T.W.Ward, Beighton scrapyard - Being scrapped RO 3/1972  

prev prev