Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2864 |
25/10/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/10/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2864 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2864 |
|
|
04/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hesslewoods: Attercliffe |
|
|