Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2866 10/11/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 10/11/1961
Withdrawn 28/02/1970
Time in Service 8 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
27A Bank Hall (New) 10/11/1961
26B Agecroft w/e 15/06/1963
9D Newton Heath w/e 19/10/1963
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn 28/02/1970

Preservation
Preservation Date 10/1987
Current Status Under Restoration/Overhaul
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2866


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1961 To Service To service as D2866
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
15/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
19/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
28/02/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2866    

prev prev