Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 324 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1190 Week
» 25852 Month
» 284711 Year
» 795813 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2867 17/11/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 17/11/1961
Withdrawn 12/09/1970
Time in Service 8 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
27A Bank Hall (New) 17/11/1961
9D Newton Heath w/e 09/11/1963
10C Fleetwood w/e 17/10/1964
10D Lostock Hall w/e 27/03/1965
8C Speke Junction w/e 22/10/1966
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
6A Chester (MR) w/e 06/06/1970
Indust. (on loan) (Tunnel Cement, Penyffordd) w/e 06/06/1970
6A Chester (MR) w/e 22/08/1970
   Withdrawn 12/09/1970

Preservation
Preservation Date 03/1995
Current Status Operational
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2867


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/11/1961 To Service To service as D2867
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
17/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
06/06/1970 Allocation      
06/06/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
22/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
12/09/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D2867    

prev prev