Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 327 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1193 Week
» 25855 Month
» 284714 Year
» 795816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2868 27/11/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 02
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service 27/11/1961
Withdrawn 31/12/1969
Time in Service 8 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
27A Bank Hall (New) 27/11/1961
10C Fleetwood w/e 22/08/1964
10D Lostock Hall w/e 10/10/1964
   Stored (at 10D) w/e 10/05/1969
10D Lostock Hall w/e 13/09/1969
   Stored w/e 27/09/1969
   Withdrawn 31/12/1969

Preservation
Preservation Date 2001
Current Status Operational
Status Date 19/09/2011
Link www.preservedshunters.co.uk/psh_shunter.php?class=2&loco=D2868


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1961 To Service To service as D2868
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
10/05/1969 To Store To Store (at 10D)    
13/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
27/09/1969 To Store To Store    
31/12/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2868    

prev prev